Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCharles v. United States Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons
DistrictMiddle District of Pennsylvania
CityHarrisburg
Case Number1:2017cv02250
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Sylvia H. Rambo
PlaintiffMichael Charles
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-021COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons, filed by Michael Charles. (Filing fee not paid. ) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letters)(ab) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 12/7/2017.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2018: # 2 Main Doc) (aaa). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-112ORDER: The Plaintiff is hereby GRANTED thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order on the docket in which to either pay the civil filing fee of four hundred dollars ($400.00) or submit an Application to proceed in forma pauperis along with a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the previous six month period. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/11/2017. (xc with IFP, Adm Order 93:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 12/7/2017.] (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-06-053MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents by Michael Charles. (ab) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 12/7/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-11-014ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order on the docket in which to either pay the filing fee in full or submit the appropriate documentation needed to proceed as a pauper. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/1/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 12/7/2017.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-305RECEIPT #34675048295 in the amount of $400.00 re 1 Complaint. (ab) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 12/7/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-056ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania at Harrisburg, Pennsylvania. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/5/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 12/7/2017.] (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-077Case electronically transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:17-cv-00782. (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-088PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2018-01-029Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS and provided TO ATTORNEY VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Proceed) (ma) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-0210ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to serve Plaintiffs complaint on the Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/2/18. (ma) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-02-0511ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Simpson, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-2212RESPONSE (titled 'REBUTTAL') to 11 Answer to Complaint, filed by Pltf Michael Charles. (rm) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-1413STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued and sent to Plaintiff. (aaa) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff