Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOmotosho v. United States Corporation et al
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2017cv02117
Date Filed2017-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alvin W. Thompson
PlaintiffJoel Omotosho of the family Omotosho
Case DescriptionJoel Omotosho submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records pertaining to its Ogden, Utah office. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Omotosho filed suit. This complaint is essentially identical to that in 3:17-cv-02101-JAM, filed by Moses Nelson in the same court.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Corporation per 28 u.s.c. § 3002
DefendantService Director of Disclosure The Department of Treasury Internal Revenue
DefendantSarah Davidson Revenue Officer
DefendantSarah Davidson Revenue Officer
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018
DefendantOthers 1 Through 100
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-191COMPLAINT against Sarah Davidson, Service Director of Disclosure, United States Corporation, Unknown Others, filed by Joel Omotosho. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-192MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Omotosho. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-193Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/19/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2018 Discovery due by 6/20/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2018 Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2017.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-194STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/19/2017.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-20Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-215ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for ruling on MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 2 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/21/2017. (Ly, T.) (Entered: 12/31/2017)
2018-01-166RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, the Court recommends that plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. # 1 ) be DISMISSED, in part. Please read the attached ruling for details. Any objections to this recommended ruling must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of being served with this order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). 11 Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 1/16/2018. (Gust, L.) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-167ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the Court's Recommended Ruling (Doc. # 6 ), plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. # 2 ) is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 1/16/2018. (Gust, L.) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-058AMENDED COMPLAINT against Service Director of Disclosure, United States Corporation, Unknown Others, filed by Joel Omotosho.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-069RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, the Court recommends that plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. # 8 ) be DISMISSED, in part, with prejudice. The Court recommends that the Amended Complaint be permitted to proceed to service against defendant Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service only. Please read the attached Ruling for details. Any objections to this Recommended Ruling must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of being served with this order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). 6 Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/6/2018. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff