Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEI v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02740
Date Filed2017-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJIDONG PEI
Case DescriptionJidong Pei, a citizen of China currently residing in New Jersey, submitted a FOIA request through his attorney to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for files on himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Pei filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5259125) filed by Jidong Pei. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons, # 3 Summons Summons, # 4 Summons Summons, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-26Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-283STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached standing order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/28/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-02-054NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-055ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on March 14, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/5/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2018, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-266Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to continue 6 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for March 14, 2018, is hereby CONTINUED to March 27, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-26Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 3/27/2018, at 2:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2018. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report in 3 weeks, and every 30 days thereafter. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-177Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-168Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/16/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-06-189Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall begin processing Plaintiff's FOIA request on or before July 8, 2018. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before July 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/20/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall begin processing Plaintiff's FOIA request on or before 7/8/2018; Joint Status Report due by 7/18/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff