Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBLIXSETH v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02756
Date Filed2017-12-21
Date Closed2018-03-22
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffTIM BLIXSETH
Case DescriptionTim Blixseth submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for emails sent or received by Lanny Breuer. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and assigned them to its complex queue for processing. Blixseth queried the agency on several occasions to check on the status of his requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Blixseth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5260208) filed by TIM BLIXSETH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons 1, # 3 Summons 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-222NOTICE of Errata Regarding Address by TIM BLIXSETH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/27/2018. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2017-12-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/28/2017 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2017-12-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/28/17. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-01-097NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-228MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-229RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Stay filed by TIM BLIXSETH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-23MINUTE ORDER DENYING as moot Defendant's 8 Motion to Stay. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-2910ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Seabrook, April) Modified to add link on 1/30/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed joint briefing schedule by February 13, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/30/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-1311PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Set/Reset Deadlines, Order and Status Report for Future Proceedings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-1412MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 proposed schedule. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a status report on or before March 7, 2018. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/14/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/7/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-03-0713Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Scheduling Conference by TIM BLIXSETH. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0714Joint MOTION for Hearing Status Conference by TIM BLIXSETH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (See Docket Entry 13 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 status report and ORDERS that 1) the parties shall submit their positions regarding the production schedule on or before March 15, 2018; and 2) a status conference on that issue is hereby set for March 22, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/8/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Parties shall submit their positions regarding the production schedule on or before 3/15/2018. Status Conference set for 3/22/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-1515MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1516MEMORANDUM re Order, by TIM BLIXSETH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1517MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1518NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that it will address Defendant's 17 Motion to Stay at the upcoming status hearing. The Government need not file any position statement in the interim. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/15/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1619NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TIM BLIXSETH. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-00593. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-1620MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, and Substitute Plaintiff by TIM BLIXSETH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa). Added MOTION to Substitute Party on 3/19/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-2021ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2018. (Himes, Lisa) Modified on 3/20/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 21 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error (Wrong Case) and counsel will refile said pleading in the correct case. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2222Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, and Substitute Plaintiff MOTION to Substitute Party filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 3/22/2018. Oral ruling dismissing case without prejudice. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-22MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff