Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarter v. USDA
DistrictWestern District of Arkansas
CityEl Dorado
Case Number1:2018cv01004
Date Filed2018-01-05
Date Closed2018-04-26
JudgeHonorable Susan O. Hickey
PlaintiffJessie Carter
Case DescriptionJessie Carter filed suit against the Department of Agriculture for placing him on a list of providers excluded from contracting with the agency. His complaint does indicate that he made a FOIA request, but he seems to be believe that the agency has withheld information from him.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUSDA and it's representatives in their official capacity at the USDA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [19]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-051COMPLAINT against USDA, filed by Jessie Carter.(cnn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-052MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION for Service by Jessie Carter. (cnn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-053Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (cnn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-054MOTIONS REFERRED: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(cnn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-095ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 9, 2018. (cnn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-096ORDER granting 2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on USDA. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 9, 2018. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(cnn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-097THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to USDA, U.S. Attorney and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re 1 Complaint, 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent, 6 Order on Motion for Service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-02-068USM 285 FORM/SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessie Carter. USDA served on 1/25/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (cnn) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-099USM 285 FORM/SUMMONS Returned Executed on USDA-Washington, DC by Jessie Carter. (cnn) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-2610MOTION to Dismiss Case by USDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Suzanne Diggs)(Webb, Mark) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2611MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by USDA. (Webb, Mark) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2712TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by USDA to Honorable Barry A. Bryant, U.S. Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 27, 2018. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-2913MOTION for Default Judgment as to USDA by Jessie Carter. (cnn) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-3014RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to USDA filed by USDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons, # 2 Exhibit Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Order)(Webb, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0515RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Jessie Carter. (cnn) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-0916MOTION to Change Venue by Jessie Carter. (cnn) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1117TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to USDA filed by Jessie Carter, and 16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Jessie Carter to Honorable Barry A. Bryant, U.S. Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 11, 2018. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1318SUPPLEMENT/Addendum by Plaintiff Jessie Carter to 15 Response to Motion to Dismiss. (cnn) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-2619ORDER granting 16 Motion to Change Venue; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 26, 2018. (cnn) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-27TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Civil Case Transferred from the Western District of Arkansas has been opened in the Arkansas Eastern as case 5:18-cv-00108 on 4/27/18. (cnn) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff