Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00045
Date Filed2018-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning its handling of public responses pertaining to ideas for deregulation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-091COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5278925) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons Office of Management and Budget Summons, # 5 Summons USAO Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-092Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (sth) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-09Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sth) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-235NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-156ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-167GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 16, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-27MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before March 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 27, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/23/2018. (hs) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-228Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting 8 . Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule, and Memorandum of Points in Support Thereof, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint proposed briefing schedule on or before March 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 23, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Joint Briefing Schedule due by 3/28/2018 (hs) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-289Joint STATUS REPORT And Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) the defendant shall confirm the results of its search and issue its final Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") response letter to the plaintiff on or before April 30, 2018; (2) the defendant shall produce to the plaintiff a declaration describing the search conducted in response to the plaintiff's FOIA request on or before May 15, 2018; and (3) the plaintiff shall file a stipulation of dismissal or, in the alternative, the parties shall confer and file a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 28, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Stipulation of Dismissal or Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/1/2018 (hs) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-06-0110Joint STATUS REPORT And Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) the defendant, on or before June 25, 2018, shall provide an update to the plaintiff regarding the status of the document review, including whether additional responsive documents will be released; (2) the defendant, on or before August 1, 2018, must produce to the plaintiff all responsive records and a final Freedom of Information Act response letter; and (3) the parties, on or before August 30, 2018, shall confer and file a joint status report, updating the Court on the status of this case and providing the Court with a briefing schedule for future pleadings, if necessary, in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 7, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff