Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00046
Date Filed2018-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning its decision to end agency support for employee fitness programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5279000) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 3 Summons EPA Summons, # 4 Summons USAO Summons, # 5 Declaration Corporate Disclosure)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (md) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-17NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to pdinerstein@peer.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Also file as a Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney General, and Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. (znmw, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/16/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 1/16/2016 (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-248NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-159ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1610GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 16, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-27MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before March 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 27, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/23/2018. (hs) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-2111NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 23, 2018, the parties shall file on the docket an additional joint status report apprising the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 23, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2018 (hs) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-2313Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 23, 2018, the parties shall file on the docket an additional joint status report apprising the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 24, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/23/2018. (hs) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-1814Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1815NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. Attorney Joshua L. Rogers terminated. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting 14 . Upon consideration of the defendant's Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to File Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before June 6, 2018, the parties shall file on the docket an additional joint status report apprising the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 21, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2018 (hs) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-0616Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before June 22, 2018, the parties shall file on the docket an additional joint status report apprising the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 11, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before September 27, 2018, the parties shall file on the docket an additional joint status report apprising the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 26, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff