Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00056
Date Filed2018-01-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning its decision finding that there was no significant environmental impact for conducting predator damage assessments in Colorado. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPATMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5281429) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-102Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-104STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/10/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-02-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/17/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-206NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-207ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE.(Yee, Marsha) Modified to add link on 2/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-21MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before March 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/21/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-058NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Kagan on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Kagan, Neil) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/6/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-149Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall process an average of at least 5000 potentially responsive pages per month and release records each month on or before the 2nd day of the month, beginning on or before April 2, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 14, 2018, and another on or before September 27, 2018. The latter joint status report shall propose either a briefing schedule for dispositive motions or seek additional time to resolve specific remaining issues. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/15/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive pages and records due by 4/2/2018, and every 2nd day of the month thereafter. Joint Status Reports due by 6/14/2018 and 9/27/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-05-3010NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Neil S. Kagan terminated. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-1411Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff