Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00061
Date Filed2018-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning a demonstration ranch or other change to the Channel Islands National Park. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5282919) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Dep't of Interior, # 5 Summons USAO)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zsth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-114STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-17NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to pdinerstein@peer.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Also file as a Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney General, and Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. (znmw, ) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/16/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 1/16/2018 (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-02-129NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-1210Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before March 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/13/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 3/15/2018. (kt) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff