Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePENA-MARTINEZ v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00022
Date Filed2018-01-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffMANUEL PENA-MARTINEZ
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-04Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/26/17. (zsth) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by MANUEL PENA-MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(zsth) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-042MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MANUEL PENA-MARTINEZ (zsth) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/17/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-043PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by MANUEL PENA-MARTINEZ (zsth) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-02-274PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff shall supplement the statement already provided to include the months of July 2017, August 2017 and December 2017. After submission of the trust fund information, the Court will determine the plaintiff's ability to pay the entire amount in one payment. If the Court determines that the plaintiff does not have sufficient funds to pay the filing fee at one time, the Court will assess an initial partial filing fee. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, monthly payments of 20 percent of the deposits made to the plaintiff's trust fund account during the preceding month will be forwarded to the clerk of the Court each time the account balance exceeds $10.00. Payments will continue until the filing fee is paid. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/26/18. (zsth) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-225MOTION to Compliance by MANUEL PENA-MARTINEZ (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Trust Account Statement)(zsth) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-246ORDER granting 5 Motion to Compliance; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $30.50 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Plaintiff is obligated hereafter to pay the United States District Court for the District of Columbia twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account as continued partial payments on the remaining balance of the $350.00 filing fee.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/24/18. (zsth) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-26Case Reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zsth) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-167RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2018. (ztd) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-308NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-119MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other response to the complaint is due by July 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/13/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/30/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff