Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv00147
Date Filed2018-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-111COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7616818.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-112Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (bnw) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-114Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Summons USAO, # 2 Summons ICE)(bnw) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-163STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/16/18. (jpa) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-22Clerks Notation re 2 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (jgs) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-225Administrative Order Staying Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse Appropriations. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/22/2018. (btql) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-156Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/23/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-217ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Discovery ends on 7/23/2018.(Shingler, Emily) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-168JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-05-119Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Melaine A. Williams replacing attorney Emily Shingler. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff