Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-01-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5297405) filed by AYMAN AISHAT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kurzban, Ira) (Entered: 01/22/2018) |
2018-01-22 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AYMAN AISHAT. Case related to Case No. 17-CV-2097. (Kurzban, Ira) (Entered: 01/22/2018) |
2018-01-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd) (Entered: 01/26/2018) |
2018-01-26 | 3 | ENTERED IN ERROR......SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) Modified on 2/9/2018 (jd). (Entered: 01/26/2018) |
2018-02-09 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile the correct summons for FOIA cases. (jd) (Entered: 02/09/2018) |
2018-02-12 | 4 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AYMAN AISHAT.(Kurzban, Ira) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-02-13 | 5 | SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 02/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (to April 11, 2018) by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/09/2018) |
2018-03-12 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before April 11, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/12/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/12/2018) |
2018-03-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/11/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 03/12/2018) |
2018-03-23 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of All Defendants (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/23/2018) |
2018-04-09 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/11/18 by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/09/2018) |
2018-04-09 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before May 11, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/9/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/09/2018) |
2018-04-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer due by 5/11/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/10/2018) |
2018-05-09 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/09/2018) |
2018-05-09 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 11, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/9/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/09/2018) |
2018-05-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/11/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 05/11/2018) |
2018-06-05 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/05/2018) |
2018-06-11 | 11 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/11/2018) |
2018-06-11 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before July 11, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/11/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/11/2018) |
2018-06-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/11/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/12/2018) |
2018-07-11 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 10, 2018 by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/11/2018) |
2018-07-11 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 10, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/11/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/11/2018) |
2018-07-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/10/2018. (tg) (Entered: 07/12/2018) |
2018-08-10 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/10/2018) |
2018-08-10 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer by September 10, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/10/18. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/10/2018) |
2018-08-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/10/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/13/2018) |
2018-09-10 | 14 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2018) |
2018-09-10 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 14 Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer on or before October 10, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/10/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/10/2018) |
2018-09-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/10/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/11/2018) |
2018-10-10 | 15 | ANSWER to Complaint by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2018) |
2018-10-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by October 24, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/10/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/10/2018) |
2018-10-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/24/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/10/2018) |
2018-10-24 | 16 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/24/2018) |
2018-10-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 16 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment by November 21, 2018; 2) Plaintiff shall file his Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by December 19, 2018; 3) Defendants shall file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and their Reply by January 16, 2019; and 4) Plaintiff shall file his reply by January 30, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/24/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/24/2018) |
2018-10-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/19/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/16/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/30/2019. Replies due by 1/30/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 10/24/2018) |
2018-11-21 | 17 | MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS D. HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts and Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Michael G.Seidel, # 3 Declaration of Toni Fuentes, # 4 Exhibit A)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2018) |
2018-12-06 | 18 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AYMAN AISHAT. (Kurzban, Ira) (Entered: 12/06/2018) |
2018-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 18 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/6/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/06/2018) |
Hide Docket Events |