Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKriemelmeyer, Frederick v. Krebs, Kevin et al
DistrictWestern District of Wisconsin
CityMadison
Case Number3:2018cv00048
Date Filed2018-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Barbara B. Crabb
PlaintiffFrederick George Kriemelmeyer
Case DescriptionFrederick Kriemeimeyer submitted FOIA requests to the National Security Division of the Department of Justice and the IRS for records concerning foreign agents' registration and oath of office. The agencies failed to respond and Kriemeimeyer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantKevin Krebs
DefendantKevin Krebs
TERMINATED: 11/09/2018
DefendantArnetta Mallory
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [6]
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [29]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Wisconsin has ruled that Frederick Kriemelmeyer's requests for discovery in two FOIA suits should be dismissed and that Kriemelmeyer's claim against Kevin Krebs is moot because Krebs responded to Kriemelmeyer's FOIA request as soon as he became aware of it. Kriemelmeyer submitted a request to the Justice Department's National Security Division for records about foreign agent registrations. The agency told him the records were publicly available on its website. Kriemelmeyer responded by asking to depose Arnette Mallory, the information specialist at the National Security Division who had responded to his request. The court rejected Kriemelmeyer's request for discovery, pointing out that "plaintiff's discovery requests do not relate to whether Mallory took adequate steps to respond to his requests. Rather, plaintiff is seeking essentially the same information he sought in his Freedom of Information Act request. He wants Mallory to create a certified statement that would provide the information he seeks. I conclude that discovery is not appropriate under these circumstances. . ." The court also rejected Kriemelmeyer's discovery request to force the Passport Office to authenticate records he requested. The court observed that "Plaintiff cannot litigate his Freedom of Information Act claim through a motion to compel." As to Krebs, the court dismissed him as a defendant and rejected Kriemelmeyer's suggestion that he was entitled to attorney's fees, noting instead that "although the lawsuit gave Krebs notice of plaintiff's outstanding request, plaintiff could have provided the same notice without litigation, by either making a phone call or sending a letter."
Issues: Litigation - Discovery, Litigation - Jurisdiction - Moot
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-221COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certified mail receipts, # 2 Exhibit B - FOA request, # 3 Cover Letter, # 4 Envelope) (jef) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-232ORDER directing plaintiff to submit $400 filing fee or an affidavit of indigency by 2/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/23/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-053Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 blank copy of court form, # 2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-094ORDER denying plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Full $400 filing fee due 3/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/9/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-055Motion for Reconsideration re 4 Order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-05Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 34690031255. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-086ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 5 motion for reconsideration 4 order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may have until 3/15/2018 to submit a detailed account of his monthly income and expenses as explained in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/8/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-217Summons Issued as to Kevin Krebs, Arnetta Mallory. (jef/sent via U.S. mail to plaintiff),(ps) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-04-168Letter from plaintiff requesting a new summons for Kevin Krebs. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-169Summons Reissued as to Defendant Kevin Krebs. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-0710Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Frederick Kriemelmeyer. Kevin Krebs served on 4/25/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Arnetta Mallory served on 4/6/2018, answer due 6/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service as to Arnetta Mallory, # 2 Proof of Service as to Jefferson Sessions, # 3 Proof of Service as to Scott Blader, # 4 Envelope) (nln)(ps). (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-2211ANSWER by Defendants Kevin Krebs, Arnetta Mallory, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-23Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiff responsible for contacting the court at (608) 264-5153. Once plaintiff's call has been received, the court will then include counsel for defendant in the conference call. [ Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-0512Amended ANSWER by Defendants Kevin Krebs, Arnetta Mallory, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-2713** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At the June 27, 2018 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference in plaintiff's two FOIA lawsuits, both sides agreed to consolidate these lawsuits for all purposes, including a consolidated bench trial on July 22, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The court will issue a preliminary pretrial conference order that commemorates the rest of the dates leading toward trial. Also, in Case No. 18-cv-148, the court extended to July 13, 2018 plaintiff's deadline to respond to the government's motion to dismiss the personal defendants (dkt. 11 ). The government's reply is due July 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2814Pretrial Conference Order - Preliminary Pretrial Packet in Pro-Se Cases attached. Dispositive Motions due 1/18/2019. Final Pretrial Submissions due 6/17/2019. Responses due 7/1/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 04:00 PM. Counsel for defendants responsible for placing the call to the court at (608) 264-5447. Court Trial set for 7/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/28/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference - Pro Se held on 6/27/2018 [:20] Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (nln),(ps) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-1315Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer re: (11 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency (Attachments: # 1 Note requesting file stamped copy be returned, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1316Letter from clerk's office in response to plaintiff's request for return of file stamped copy. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-2317Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Return of Copy, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2318Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Note from plaintiff Requesting for Return of Copy, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2419Letter from clerk's regarding discovery requests and request for file stamped copies. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-09-0620Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 12/1/17, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter dated 3/7/18, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim for discovery and mail receipt, # 4 Cover Letter and Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set Briefing as to Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Compel. Defendants' Brief in Opposition due 9/14/2018. Plaintiff's Brief in Reply due 9/21/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-1021Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - August 27, 2018 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Cover Letter and Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set Deadlines as to (22 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 21 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion to Compel. Defendants' Brief in Opposition due 9/17/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1322ORDER in case 3:18-cv-00048-bbc; granting (11) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:18-cv-00148-bbc. Defendants Tillerson and Arde are DISMISSED asdefendants from this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/13/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-1423Brief in Opposition by Defendants Kevin Krebs, Arnetta Mallory re: (20 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 21 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Motion to Compel, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer and to Dismiss Defendant Kevin Krebs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - August 28, 2018 Letter to Kriemelmeyer, # 2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1424Declaration of Natasha Hudgins filed by Defendants Kevin Krebs, Arnetta Mallory re: (21 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 20 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion to Compel, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 18, 2018 Ltr to Kriemelmeyer) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1725Brief in Opposition by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency re: (22 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 21 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion to Compel, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1826Declaration of Natasha Hudgins filed by Defendants Kevin Krebs, Arnetta Mallory re: (21 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 20 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion to Compel, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 18, 2018 Letter to Kriemelmeyer, # 2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-2827Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer in Support of (20 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 21 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B - Envelopes, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-2828Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer in Support of (22 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 21 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Student ID, inmate ID and driver's license, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Attachment replaced on 10/2/2018) (jef). (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-11-0929ORDER denying (20), (21) Motions to Compel in case 3:18-cv-00048-bbc; denying (21), (22) Motions to Compel. in case 3:18-cv-00148-bbc. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Kevin Krebbs are DISMISSED as moot. Krebs is DISMISSED as a defendant. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2019-01-0430MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and for the Award of Costs, captioned to case 18-cv-148-bbc, by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-0731Motion for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motion Deadline by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-0732Declaration of Antonio M. Trillo filed by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency re: (31 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) MOTION for Extension of Time, Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-0733** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting (31)Motion for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motion Deadline . Dispositive Motions due 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/7/2019. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-1534Motion for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motions Deadline by Defendant Arnetta Mallory. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-1635** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting (34) Motion for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motions Deadline . The dispositive motions deadline is extended to February 19, 2019 in both case nos. 18-cv-00048-bbc and 18-cv-148-bbc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/16/2019. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-02-1936MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant Arnetta Mallory. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1937Brief in Support of (37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Arnetta Mallory Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1938Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan filed by Defendant Arnetta Mallory re: (37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kriemelmeyer's November 13, 2017 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - NSD's December 1, 2017 Acknowledgement Letter, # 3 Exhibit C - NSD's March 7, 2018 Final Response Letter) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) Modified on 2/20/2019: This declaration is missing paragraph numbers 6, 10, 16, 17 and 18. See 44 for corrected declaration. (lak) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1939Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Arnetta Mallory re: (37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Set Briefing Deadlines as to (37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. [ Pro Se Summary Judgment Procedure for Cases Assigned to Judge Crabb attached.] Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 3/22/2019. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 4/1/2019. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1940MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1941Brief in Support of (41 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 40 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1942Declaration of Eric F. Stein filed by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency re: (41 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 40 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request Dec. 6, 2017, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Political Status Apr. 27, 2017, # 3 Exhibit C - State Dept. Letter Jan. 2, 2018, # 4 Exhibit D - FOIA Request Jan. 15, 2018, # 5 Exhibit E - Kriemelmeyer Identification, # 6 Exhibit F - State Dept. Letter May 7, 2018, # 7 Exhibit G - Kriemelmeyer Letter May 12, 2018, # 8 Exhibit H - State Dept. Letter Feb. 19, 2019) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1943Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency re: (41 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 40 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-20Set Briefing Deadlines as to (40 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 41 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. [ Pro Se Summary Judgment Procedure for Cases Assigned to Judge Crabb attached.] Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 3/22/2019. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 4/1/2019. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-2144Corrected Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan filed by Defendant Arnetta Mallory (with correct paragraph numbering) re: (37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kriemelmeyer's November 13, 2017 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - NSD's December 1, 2017 Acknowledgement Letter, # 3 Exhibit C - NSD's March 7, 2018 Final Response Letter, # 4 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-0445Notice of Appearance filed by David Daly Conway for Defendant Arnetta Mallory. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Conway, David),(ps) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0446Notice of Appearance filed by David Daly Conway for Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Conway, David),(ps) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0447Notice of removal of the instant matter to arbitration (case 18-cv-148-bbc) by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0448Answer / Brief in Opposition (case 18-cv-48-bbc) by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer re: (36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Arnetta Mallory. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-1249Brief in Reply by Defendant Arnetta Mallory in Support of (36 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 37 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-1350Brief in Opposition by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency re: (48 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Notice of removal of the instant matter to arbitration filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) Modified on 3/14/2019. (lak) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-1851Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer in Support of (48 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Notice of removal of the instant matter to arbitration. (Attachments: # 1 Filing notice and dkt. 47 with notes of refusal for cause without dishonor and without recourse to me, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-2152Copy of Dkt. 51 with note of "no contract refusal for cause without dishonor and without recourse" re (47 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 48 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Notice of removal of the instant matter to arbitration (48 in case 18-cv-148-bbc) by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-0153Notice by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency of Plaintiff's Failure to Oppose Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (Conway, David),(ps) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-1554Response filed by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer re: (53 in 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 54 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Notice of Plaintiff's Failure to Oppose Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar