Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDiehl v. FBI
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2018cv00077
Date Filed2018-01-26
Date Closed2018-04-02
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffDavid A Diehl
Case DescriptionDavid Diehl, a federal prisoner, submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning hard drives that were used in his prosecutions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied them both. Diehl filed administrative appeals of the denials. The agency denied his appeals and Diehl filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantFBI
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-261COMPLAINT, filed by David A Diehl. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-262MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by David A Diehl.. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (cj) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (cj) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-313ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IFP/$400 due within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application) (td) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-03-074ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause, within twenty (20) days of the entry of this order, why his complaint should not be dismissed for want of prosecution or for failure to pay the filing fee. as to David A Diehl. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-265RESPONSE to 4 Order to Show Cause by David A Diehl. (td) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-04-026ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff