Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSUGGS v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictNorthern District of Florida
CityTallahassee
Case Number4:2018cv00058
Date Filed2018-01-25
Date Closed2018-02-15
JudgeJUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE
PlaintiffCALVIN EARL SUGGS, JR
Case DescriptionCalvin Suggs filed suit against the Social Security Administration and the IRS to force them to provide records about himself. While Suggs mentions the Privacy Act, he does seem to have made any kind of FOIA request.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DefendantIRS
DefendantBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-251COMPLAINT (titled "(Notice of Intent) Violation of Privacy Act Violation of Freedom of Information Act") against BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS, IRS, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by CALVIN EARL SUGGS, JR. (vkm)***NO FEE/IFP OR SERVICE COPIES*** (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-262Notice to Pro Se. (vkm) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: 1 Complaint. (vkm) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-313ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and a civil rights complaint form (IFP/Fee due by 3/1/2018 . First Amended Complaint/Voluntary Dismissal due by 3/1/2018 . Notify Chambers on 3/1/2018 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/31/2018. (vkm) ***FORMS PROVIDED AS DIRECTED*** (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-124NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (titled "Violation of the Freedom of Information Act & Privacy Act (1974)") by CALVIN EARL SUGGS, JR (vkm) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-14ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (vkm) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-155ORDER - Petitioner's filing (ECF No. 4 ) is treated as a notice of voluntary dismissal and this case shall be considered closed upon entry of this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/15/2018. (vkm) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff