Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOHEN MILSTEIN SELLERS & TOLL PLLC v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00229
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCOHEN MILSTEIN SELLERS & TOLL PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the Alaska Assets produced to the SEC by Miller Energy and others. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and divided it into nine separate requests. The agency denied five of those requests on the basis of Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Four other requests were denied under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Cohen Milstein filed administrative appeals of the denials. On appeal, the agency found that records produced before February 2011 could be disclosed, but the agency affirmed the denial as to records produced after February 2011. That decision relied solely on Exemption 7(A) as the basis of its denial on appeal. Cohen Milstein then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5312330) filed by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons)(Wang, Times) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-01Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-012SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-013Case randomly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-094REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Attorney General filed by COHEN MILSTEIN SELLERS & TOLL PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Attorney)(Wang, Times) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-125SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/20/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/22/2018. (Wang, Times) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/20/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 2/2/2018. (See Docket Entry 6 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-288Joint MOTION to Stay Case by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-01MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to Stay. All deadlines are hereby STAYED until June 1, 2018, at which time the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order for moving forward with this case Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/1/18. (DJS) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-05-309Joint MOTION to Stay the proceedings by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Joint Motion to Stay. This action is hereby stayed until August 31, 2018. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order by September 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/30/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff