Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv00146
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert S. Lasnik
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe Attorney General of Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for communications from the chair of the commission to any other commissioners. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the State of Washington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Energy Regulatory Commission an agency of the United States
DefendantKevin J. McIntyre in his official capacity as Chairman of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5183896) Attorney William R Sherman added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Sherman, William) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-01Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (ST) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-012Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, Kevin J. McIntyre. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-03-213NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, Kevin J. McIntyre. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-224ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, Kevin J. McIntyre.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-265ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-036AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to P.Petrut on 2/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Sherman, William) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-037Stipulated MOTION for Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/3/2018, (Sherman, William) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-048ORDER granting parties' 7 Stipulated Motion for relief of 26(f) Conference; Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-06-069STATUS REPORT by Defendant Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-07Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report deadline extended to 7/16/2018 per Dkt. # 9. (KERR) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-07-1210JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Sherman, William) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff