Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00255
Date Filed2018-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffNOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING
Case DescriptionNOVAD Management Consulting submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning a contract with DEVAL. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NOVAD that it would not be able to respond within the statutory time limit. NOVAD Management Consulting then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
HUD
751 7th Street SW
Washington, DC 20410
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-021COMPLAINT against HUD (Filing fee $ 400) filed by NOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Griffith, Marlon) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/9/2018) (jd). (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-02Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (jd) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09Filing Fee Received: $ 400, Receipt Number: 4616089419. (jd) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (jd) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-132Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING. (Griffith, Marlon) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-133REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by NOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by NOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Griffith, Marlon) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-134SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-03-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/20/2018. (Griffith, Marlon) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/21/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2018. (Griffith, Marlon) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-217NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-238ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Rogers, Joshua) Modified to add link on 3/26/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before May 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on April 3, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/3/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-05-039Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 14, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2018 (hs) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 11, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-0211Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff