Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSHISHA v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00268
Date Filed2018-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJANET SHISHA
Case DescriptionJanet Shisha submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning herself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Shisha filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5319709) filed by JANET SHISHA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (zmd) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-082NOTICE by JANET SHISHA (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-05-083ORDER: In order to avoid a mandatory dismissal of this action, on or before May 29, 2018, Plaintiff shall either (1) cause process to be served upon Defendant and file proof of service with the Court, or (2) file a motion to enlarge time to serve process and show good cause, if any, for failure to serve process in a timely fashion. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/8/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-254ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST to Issue Summons by JANET SHISHA (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Piston, Michael) Modified on 5/29/2018 to correct docket text/event (jf). (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 4 MOTION to Issue Summons was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the 30 day FOIA summons. Counsel is instructed to use the "Request to Issue Summons" event and not the "Motion(s)" event. (jf) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-295REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JANET SHISHA. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-306SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-307AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING as to the UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 5/30/2018 (Piston, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2018 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-308AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING as to the United States Attorney General. (Piston, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2018 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-07-039ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/3/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-2010Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/20/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar