Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of California v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv00805
Date Filed2018-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffState of California
Case DescriptionThe Attorney General of California submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning additional requirements on immigration enforcement to qualify for the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program run by the Office of Justice Management. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the State of California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantOffice of Justice Programs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-071COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12090897.). Filed by State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 2/7/2018) Modified on 2/12/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-072Proposed Summons. (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 2/7/2018) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-073Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-124Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-125Summons Issued as to Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-266CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued as to USA (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-267CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued as to USA (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-278CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-279CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California.. (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 2/27/2018) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-1310STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Enlarge Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 3/13/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1511CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/29/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1612CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice.. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 3/16/2018) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-0613ANSWER to Complaint byOffice of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-2014ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2315STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/23/2018) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2416ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 4/24/2018) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-2517Order, signed 4/25/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 15 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-06-2918STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 6/29/2018) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0219Order, signed 7/2/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 18 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference re-set for 8/17/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-08-0820JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 8/8/2018) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar