Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2018cv00247
Date Filed2018-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Paul Papak
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-071Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5305126 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc. against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Proposed Summons USA DofO, USA DoJ, Dept of Homeland Security). (Green, Derek) Modified to correct parties in docket text on 2/7/2018 (sss). (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-072Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.. (Green, Derek) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-083Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 6/8/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/9/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 7/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (jtj) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-084Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-135Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.. (Green, Derek) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-03-146Answer to 1 Complaint,, . Filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-147ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference set for 5/7/2018 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-05-048Joint Status Report . Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.. (Green, Derek) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-049Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.. (Green, Derek) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0710MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference held 5/7/18. Order: All case deadlines are Stayed. Formal order to follow. Order: Setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 6/26/2018 at 10:00AM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at or shortly after the appointed time. Derek Green present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Kevin Danielson present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0711ORDER regarding discovery issues. Signed on 5/7/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-2612MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Telephonic Status Conference held 6/26/18. Order: All case deadlines remain Stayed. Formal order to follow. Order: Setting a further Telephonic Status Conference for 8/31/2018 at 10:00AM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at or shortly after the appointed time. Derek Green; Alicia LeDuc; Kelly Simon present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Kevin Danielson present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2613ORDER: Defendants are to produce 2,500 pages of records per month in July and in August 2018. Signed on 6/26/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar