Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHernandez v. United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of Mississippi
CityEastern Hattiesburg
Case Number2:2018cv00019
Date Filed2018-02-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Keith Starrett
PlaintiffGabino Ramos Hernandez
Case DescriptionGabino Hernandez submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning an incident in which Hernandez was shot at by agents even though he had his hands in the air. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request on the basis of Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Hernandez filed an administrative appeal, which was denied by the agency. Hernandez then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-091COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3634058), filed by Gabino Ramos Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Letter dated 9/29/2017, # 3 Exhibit B - Letter dated 11/27/2016)(LDR) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-162MOTION for Timothy W. Cerniglia to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabino Ramos Hernandez (Carlisle, Arthur) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16TEXT ONLY ORDER denying 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The certificate of good standing is not current. See L.U.Civ. R. 83.1(d)(4). The motion is denied without prejudice to movants right to file a corrected motion in conformance with the local rules. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 16, 2018 (KPM) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16DOCKET ANNOTATION as to 2 : Incorrect form has been used. Attorney is referred to the Court's website, mssd.uscourts.gov, under "Local Rules and General Orders", where official Form 6: Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice may be found. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct form. (LDR) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-203Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (CS) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-234MOTION for Timothy W. Cerniglia to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabino Ramos Hernandez (Carlisle, Arthur) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Timothy W. Cerniglia is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 23, 2018 (KPM) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-26Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Timothy W. Cerniglia $ 100, receipt number 24643005602 (LDR) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-135SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabino Ramos Hernandez. United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018. (Carlisle, Arthur) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-136SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabino Ramos Hernandez. United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/28/2018. (Carlisle, Arthur) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-05-017Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement answer due 6/15/2018. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 1, 2018 (KPM) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-02DOCKET ANNOTATION as to 7 : Wrong division is listed. Attorney is directed to correct the error in future filings to read, Eastern Division. (LDR) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-06-158ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Bureau of Immigration and Custom Enforcement.(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar