Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAna Muniz v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv01286
Date Filed2018-02-16
Date Closed2018-06-26
JudgeJudge Michael W. Fitzgerald
PlaintiffAna Muniz
Case DescriptionAna Muniz, a professor of Criminology at the University of California, Irvine, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the ICEGangs database. The agency acknowledged her request. She made several attempts to check on the status of her request, but after the agency failed to provide any substantive response, Muniz filed suit.

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-161COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21274621 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party Ana Muniz(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-162Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-203NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-204NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-205NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 2 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) Modified on 2/20/2018 (car). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-206NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-207NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-208CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-269Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-271060 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (iv) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-05-0111STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 6/4/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0212ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT 11 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security shall have up to and including June 4, 2018, to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (iv) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-3013Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 7/5/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3014ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT 13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security shall have up to and including July 5, 2018, to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (iv) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-2615Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2616DISMISSAL ORDER 15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the separately filed stipulation of the parties, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees, costs, and expenses. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff