Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMinkovski et al v. US Department of Treasury
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2018cv01034
Date Filed2018-02-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Margo K. Brodie
PlaintiffAlyona Minkovski Individually
PlaintiffMatthew Stoller Individually
Case DescriptionAlyona Minkovski and Matthew Stoller, both independent journalists, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning Sheryl Sandberg when she served as Chief of Staff to former Secretary of the Treasury Lawrence Summers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted Minkovski and Stoller news media fee status. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, Minkovski and Stoller filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10209223 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Alyona Minkovski, Matthew Stoller. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Leaf, Samuel) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-212In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-213This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-21NOTICE: The Proposed summons is rejected; Please see 3 . The Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-014Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint, by Alyona Minkovski, Matthew Stoller (Leaf, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-025Summons Issued as to US Department of Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-04-096ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by US Department of Treasury. (Singh, Rukhsanah) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-117SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on May 4, 2018 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Chambers Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-048Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 5/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Leaf for plaintiffs, Singh for defendant. The parties request 30 days to determine whether the manner in which the case will proceed, and whether court intervention is warranted. COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT BY JUNE 4, 2018. The report shall suggest a date for either a further conference or an updated status report. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-06-049STATUS REPORT by US Department of Treasury (Singh, Rukhsanah) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall file a joint status report letter by June 25, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/5/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-2510STATUS REPORT by US Department of Treasury (Singh, Rukhsanah) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-25SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 12:30 p.m. on June 27, 2018 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for defendant is directed to arrange the call with all parties as well as immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/25/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-2711Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Leaf for plaintiffs, Singh for defendant. Defendant will submit a letter by July 6 that proposes a time frame for producing the document(s) that plaintiffs are seeking in this action. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-0612STATUS REPORT by US Department of Treasury (Singh, Rukhsanah) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-09SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on July 18, 2018 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to arrange the call with all parties as well as immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Counsel shall be prepared to address 12 Status Report Letter. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/9/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1813Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 7/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Leaf for plaintiffs, Singh for defendant. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on consent by August 10; defendant reserves all affirmative defenses. Defendant will submit a premotion conference application in anticipation of moving for summary judgment by September 12, 2018. Plaintiffs reserve their right to seek discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) before submitting opposition to the motion; defendant advises it will likely oppose such discovery if sought. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-3114NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Anne Mahoney on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Mahoney, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar