Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMcGinnis v. Atlanta VBA Regional Office
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv00762
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steve C. Jones
PlaintiffDanny McGinnis
Case DescriptionDanny McGinnis submitted a FOIA request to the Atlanta Regional Office of the Department of Veterans Affairs. The agency denied his request and McGinnis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantAtlanta VBA Regional Office
DefendantPatrick Zondervan
DefendantPatrick Zondewan
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Danny McGinnis. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-22Submission of Complaint for Review; w/in 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-22Submission of 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (eop) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-232REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Plaintiff's 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. If the District Court adopts this recommendation, the undersigned further RECOMMENDS that the Plaintiff be advised that he must pay the filing fee within (14) days of the District Court's Order denying the 1 Application. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this action may be dismissed for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 2/23/2018. (sap) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-233ORDER for Service of 2 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 2/23/2018. (sap) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Danny McGinnis re 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (sap) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-064ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-00762-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 3/5/2018. (sap) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Danny McGinnis re 4 Order Reassigning Case. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (sap) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-07Filing Fee Paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 100703. (rjs) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Submission of Fee Payment Received and 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to District Judge Steve C Jones. (rjs) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-125ORDER adopting 2 Report and Recommendations as the order of the Court to the extent not mooted by the payment of the filing fee. The 1 in forma pauperis application is DENIED. The proper fee having now been paid, the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint on the public docket. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 3/12/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-126COMPLAINT filed by Danny McGinnis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-12Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Danny McGinnis re 5 Order. (rjs) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-277Summons Issued as to Patrick Zondervan. (rjs) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-278Summons Issued as to Atlanta VBA Regional Office. (rjs) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-249Return of Service Executed by Danny McGinnis as to Defendants Atlanta VBA Regional Office and Patrick Zondervan. (rjs) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-07-1110MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Danny McGinnis. (rjs) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12Submission of 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1311RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Atlanta VBA Regional Office, Patrick Zondervan. (Cooper, Lisa) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar