Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleARRICK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00450
Date Filed2018-02-23
Date Closed2018-04-12
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffKEITH ARRICK, SR.
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
AppealD.C. Circuit 18-5134
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [5]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-23Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 02/21/2018. (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-02-231COMPLAINT against KEITH ARRICK, SR filed by KEITH ARRICK, SR.(zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-02-232MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KEITH ARRICK, SR (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-02-233PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by KEITH ARRICK, SR (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-284NOTICE by KEITH ARRICK, SR re 1 Complaint (zsb) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-125MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/11/2018. (zsb) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-126ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/11/2018.(zsb) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff