Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFowlers v. Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictDistrict of Hawaii
CityHawaii
Case Number1:2018cv00084
Date Filed2018-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJUDGE HELEN GILLMOR
PlaintiffAlexis Kelvin Fowlers a man ("Prosecutor")
Case DescriptionAlexis Kevin Fowler filed suit against the IRS, claiming a cause of action under the Fair Debt Collection Act as well as FOIA and the Privacy Act. His claims are for invasion of privacy and contain no FOIA-related claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantInternal Revenue Service Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service ("Wrong doer")
DefendantColin P. Kelly a man, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service ("Wrong doer")
DefendantJean Flash a man/woman, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service ("Wrong doer")
DefendantByron D. Endo a man, Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Office 12, FOIA Public Liason ("Wrong doer")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Alexis Kelvin Fowlers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-062Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 5/7/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Alexis Kelvin Fowlers served by first class mail to the address of record on March 6, 2018. (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-063DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/6/2018. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Alexis Kelvin Fowlers served by first class mail to the address of record on March 6, 2018. A copy of the court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs form was included in the mailing to Mr. Fowlers. on (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-274Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI023569 re 1 Complaint. (emt, ) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-115PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Kelvin Fowlers. Internal Revenue Service served on 4/11/2018. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-116PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Kelvin Fowlers. Colin P. Kelly served on 4/6/2018. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-177NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Helper on behalf of Internal Revenue Service on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff