Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv01459
Date Filed2018-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
Case DescriptionThe Center for Investigative Reporting submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning its investigation into the 1965 ambush of two African-American law enforcement officers in Varnado, Louisiana. One officer died while the other survived. The FBI finally closed the investigation in 2016. The LSU School of Mass Communications Cold Case Project requested the file in 2016, which was disclosed in heavily redacted form. CIR requested the unredacted file. CIR also asked for a fee waiver and expedited processing. The FBI denied CIR's request for expedited processing and placed it in the news media fee category. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Expedited processing

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-061COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12164323). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/6/2018) Modified on 3/7/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-062Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-063Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-074Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/21/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-075Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-076Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-097CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR).. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/9/2018) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-198CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/19/2018) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-129CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Justice.. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 4/12/2018) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-1210ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of Justice. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 4/12/2018) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-05-0811To all parties and counsel of record:Please take notice that due to the Court's unavailability, the case management conference currently scheduled for June 7, 2018 is continued to June 13, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-0812ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 5/8/2018) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-1013NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1014ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on June 11, 2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-06-0515JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 6/5/2018) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-1116ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 6/11/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-1217CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the case management conference currently scheduled for June 13, 2018 is continued to June 21, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-2018ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference re-set for 8/23/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Signed by Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on 06/20/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-08-1019CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2320CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that by the request of the parties, the case management conference currently scheduled for August 23, 2018 is continued to October 17, 2018 at 11:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-10-1021CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1122ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/11/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar