Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00516
Date Filed2018-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the hiring of Deputy Assistant Secretary, Office of Immigration Statistics, Marc Rosenblum. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-061COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5360651) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Defendant, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-094STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 9, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/30/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/30/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-028AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM.(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-249NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2910NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Meriwether Hethmon on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Hethmon, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-3011ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-0812NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-1313Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by July 25, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 14, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2018. (tg) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-07-2714Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Hethmon, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by September 10, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 30, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2018. (tg) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-09-0715NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L. Casale on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1016Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by October 12, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-1217Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by November 16, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 15, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar