Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMIDDLE EAST FORUM v. UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00529
Date Filed2018-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffMIDDLE EAST FORUM
Case DescriptionThe Middle East Forum submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning a grant given to World Vision, Inc. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Middle East Forum that because the records contained potentially confidential business information it was sending a pre-disclosure notification to World Vision. After hearing nothing further from the agency the Middle East Forum filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5363752) filed by MIDDLE EAST FORUM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to USAID)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-08Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-04-233NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-234ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-245ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 22, 2018. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/24/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-216STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must begin a rolling production of documents at a rate of at least 250 pages per month. The parties must file a joint status report by October 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/22/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar