Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBravo et al v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2018cv01414
Date Filed2018-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carol Bagley Amon
PlaintiffDominique Bravo
PlaintiffAmerican Oversight
Case DescriptionDominique Bravo and American Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the FBI and the National Security Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning the FISA application submitted to the Foreign Surveillance Intelligence Court to obtain a warrant allowing for surveillance of Carter Page. Bravo and American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The FBI and NSD granted their request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Bravo and American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-071COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10256574 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Dominique Bravo, American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B) (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-072NOTICE by American Oversight (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Counsel is advised to resubmit original Proposed Summonses. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-083In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-084This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-085NOTICE by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo Proposed Summons (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-087Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Sessions summons, # 2 Donoghue summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-096Letter re: Summonses by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-12ORDER re 6 Letter re: Summonses filed by Dominique Bravo, American Oversight. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reissue the summonses with the requested language regarding 30 days to answer. This is a FOIA action. See 5 USC 552(a)(4)(C). See ECF Nos. 1-2, 1-3, 1-4 (the annotated proposed summonses). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/12/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-128Summons Reissued as to U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Donoghue, # 2 Sessions) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-289MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10309627. by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Admission Information) (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-2810MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10309858. by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Admission Information, # 3 Admission Information) (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-28ORDER granting 9 Motion for Daniel A. McGrath Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/28/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-28ORDER granting 10 Motion for Cerissa Irene Cafasso Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/28/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-2911NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. McGrath on behalf of American Oversight, Dominique Bravo (notification declined or already on case) (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2912NOTICE of Appearance by Cerissa Cafasso on behalf of American Oversight, Dominique Bravo (notification declined or already on case) (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-1113SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominique Bravo, American Oversight. U.S. Department of Justice served on 3/20/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1314Letter seeking docket correction by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13SCHEDULING ORDER re 14 Letter. After reviewing the letter and relevant provision, the Court finds that Plaintiffs appear to be correct about the service requirements under the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS Defendant, which apparently has been served, ( see D.E. # 13 ), to "serve an answer or otherwise plead to" Plaintiffs' complaint "within thirty days after service," not the usual 60 days after service under Rule 12(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 5 U.S.C. s 552(a)(4)(C). So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on April 13, 2018. (Zapana, Victor) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-2515MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's complaint to May 21, 2018 by U.S. Department of Justice. (Riley, Susan) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-25ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. On consent of the parties, the Court GRANTS the government's motion. The government shall respond to the Complaint no later than May 21, 2018 . So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on April 25, 2018. (Zapana, Victor) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-2116NOTICE of Appearance by Cesar Lopez-Morales on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2117ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2318SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 6/15/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/23/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-0719Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference and in Compliance With Court's Scheduling Order by U.S. Department of Justice. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-11ORDER granting 19 Motion to Adjourn Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 12:15 PM. Joint Status Report is due by 7/27/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/11/2018. (Genovese, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-2720STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed with Defendant by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-30ORDER re 20 Status Report filed by Dominique Bravo, American Oversight. Further Status Report is due 9/6/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/30/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-09-0621STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed with Defendant by American Oversight, Dominique Bravo (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06ORDER re 21 Status Report filed by Dominique Bravo, American Oversight. Further Joint Status Report is due 10/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/6/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar