Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv02054
Date Filed2018-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Analisa Torres
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times Reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the application to the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court to authorize surveillance on Carter Page. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage and the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-071COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14781435)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-072CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-073RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-074REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-08CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (laq) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (laq) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Case Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-085INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2018 at 10:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/8/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-096ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (pc) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-167NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Krause on behalf of Department Of Justice. (Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-198LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for April 2, 2018 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew E. Krause dated March 19, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File the parties' joint pre-conference letter and proposed scheduling order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew E. Krause dated March 19, 2018. Document filed by Department Of Justice.(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-199ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting in part and denying in part 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 2, 2018 is ADJOURNED to April 16, 2018, at 11:40 a.m. The parties shall file their joint letter and proposed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. (Initial Conference set for 4/16/2018 at 11:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/19/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-0910LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David E. McCraw dated 04/09/2018 re: Parties' joint letter proposing schedule. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1011MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 10 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. By May 18, 2018, the Government shall file a status letter. By July 20, 2018, the Government shall finish producing all responsive, non-exempt documents on a rolling basis. By August 3, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status letter. The initial conference scheduled for April 16, 2018 is ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/10/2018) (cf) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1312ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Department Of Justice.(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff