Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGlancy Prongay and Murray LLP v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv01942
Date Filed2018-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Stephen V. Wilson
PlaintiffGlancy Prongay and Murray LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Glancy, Prongay & Murray submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Antitrust Division. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-081COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21379478 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Attorney Jonathan M Rotter added to party Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP(pty:pla))(Rotter, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-082Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-083CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-084NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP, (Rotter, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-125NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-126NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-12760 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Justice. (jtil) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-148NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-199PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP, upon Defendant United States Department of Justice served on 3/12/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Lilian Arratia, Authorized Agent at U.S. Attorneys Office. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Desiree Brown, Authorized Agent. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-1010Effective April 19, 2018, Judge Rosenberg will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 550 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 550 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-05-0911STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/10/2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-06-2812ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT 11 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson that Defendant, United States Department of Justice shall have to and including 7/10/2018, within which to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-1013ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Justice.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1214ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/6/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1715STIPULATION to Reschedule Initial Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rotter, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-1916ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Reschedule 15 . (Status Conference continued to 8/20/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-2017MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court sets the following dates: Court Trial - December 18, 2018 at 9:00 a.m.; Pretrial Conference - Waived. The parties are given until November to resolve the case. : Court Reporter: N/A. (lom) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-2218CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar