Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEllis Snowton v. U. S. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv01019
Date Filed2018-03-08
Date Closed2018-04-06
JudgeJudge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr
PlaintiffPiper Lakay Ellis Snowton
DefendantU. S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-081APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Piper Lakay Ellis Snowton. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Notice, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-12Submission of 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, submitted to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-202LETTER/REQUEST and NOTICE of Change of Address for Piper Lakay Ellis Snowton. SASE placed in file. (jkl) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-04-033ORDER GRANTING 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit this action to the District Court for review of Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915( e )(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/3/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Piper Lakay Ellis Snowton re 3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (jkl) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-034COMPLAINT filed by Piper Lakay Ellis Snowton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-035CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Piper Lakay Ellis Snowton. (jkl) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Submission of 4 Complaint to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash for frivolity review. (jkl) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-066ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS. The Court clearly lacks subject matter jurisdiction of this case based upon diversity of citizenship. Absent a claim under the Federal Tort Claims Act, the United States has sovereign immunity. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/5/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-067CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action as frivolous. (jkl)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-06Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Piper Lakay Ellis Snowton re 7 Clerk's Judgment, 6 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous,. (jkl) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-06Civil Case Terminated. (jkl) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff