Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAJUC et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00566
Date Filed2018-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJOHNMARK MAJUC
PlaintiffJOSEPH JOK
Case DescriptionJohnmark Majuc, Joseph Jok, Turjuman Ramadam Adam, and Shafika Hassan submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the investigation of BNP Paribus, a global bank. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but denied them under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). The requesters filed administrative appeals, which were denied. Majuc and the other requesters then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Opinion/Order [41]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5372363) filed by JOHNMARK MAJUC, JOSEPH JOK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plea Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Stmt of Facts, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Confirmation Email, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Ack of FOIL Request, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Request Denial, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Appeal, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 7-20-17 Acknowledgment, # 10 Exhibit 10 - 8-4-17 Acknowledgment, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Appeal Denial, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons)(Heavlin, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-13Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (zmd) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-152REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOHNMARK MAJUC, JOSEPH JOK. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Heavlin, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-153MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabth Curran, :Firm- McKool Smith, P.C., :Address- One Bryant Park, 47th Floor, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - 212-402-9481. Fax No. - 212-402-9444 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5375140. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Heavlin, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-16MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth Curran is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/16/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/20/2018 (Heavlin, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/19/2018. (Heavlin, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2018. (Heavlin, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-178NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Lee on behalf of JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Lee, Phillip) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-179NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. Attorney Tiffany Heavlin terminated. (Lee, Phillip) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-2310ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2411ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 8, 2018. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/24/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/8/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-0112MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas B. Watson, :Firm- McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C., :Address- 300 South Grand Ave., 29th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-694-1200. Fax No. - 213-694-1234 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5454523. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Phillip) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0113MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathryn L. Boyd, :Firm- McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C., :Address- 300 South Grand Ave., 29th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - (213)694-1200. Fax No. - (213)694-1234 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5454646. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Phillip) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Thomas B. Watson is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/01/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kathryn L. Boyd is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/01/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-0915ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before August 17, 2018; (2) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 17, 2018; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 17, 2018; and (4) Plaintiffs' Reply is due on or before November 7, 2018. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/09/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/17/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/17/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/17/2018. Plaintiffs' Cross Motion due by 9/17/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/17/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/7/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-08-1016Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 18, 2018; (2) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 18, 2018; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before November 16, 2018; and (4) Plaintiffs' Reply is due on or before December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/14/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2018. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/18/2018. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 11/16/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/7/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-09-1717MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1718Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 18, 2018; (2) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before November 19, 2018; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before December 19, 2018; and (4) Plaintiffs' Reply is due on or before January 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/17/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/18/2018. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/19/2018. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 12/19/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/9/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-1719Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-18MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Summary Judgment shall be due on or before November 8, 2018; Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before December 10, 2018; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment shall be due on or before January 18, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before February 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/18/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 11/8/2018. Plaintiff's Opposition Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and due by 12/10/2018. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 1/18/2019.. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/8/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-1320Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before November 20, 2018; Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before January 10, 2019; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before February 12, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before March 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/20/2018. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/10/2019. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 2/12/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/5/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-2021MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Public Declaration of John E. Cunningham III)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-2022Consent MOTION for Leave to File Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Ex Parte and In Camera Declaration of John E. Cunningham III)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-21MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Submit Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/21/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2019-01-0723Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Consent Motion for Extension of the Time. The amended schedule is as follows: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before January 31, 2019; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before March 5, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before March 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/08/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 1/31/2019. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 3/5/2019. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 3/26/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-3024Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before February 28, 2019; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion and Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before April 2, 2019; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before April 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/31/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 2/28/2019. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 4/2/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 4/23/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-2625Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion and Opposition shall be filed on or before March 14, 2019; Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before April 23, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before May 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/26/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs' Cross Motion and Opposition due by 3/14/2019. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 4/23/2019. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 5/14/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/10/2019)
2019-03-1126Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-12MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion and Opposition to Defendant's Motion shall be filed on or before April 11, 2019; Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before May 21, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before June 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/12/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Cross Motion and Opposition due by 4/11/2019. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 5/21/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/11/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-1027Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-11MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before April 18, 2019; Defendant's Opposition and Reply shall be filed on or before June 19, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before July 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/11/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 4/18/2019. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 6/19/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/10/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1828Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration of Thomas B. Watson)(Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-1829Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment <MOTION to Take Judicial Notice/i> by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration of Thomas B. Watson)(Watson, Thomas). Added MOTION to Take Judicial Notice on 4/19/2019 (jf). (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-06-1830Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-19MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendant's Opposition shall be filed on or before July 19, 2019 and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before August 12, 2019. No further modifications of the schedule will be permitted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 7/19/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 8/12/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-0331NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Folkman on behalf of JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-1932REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-1933RESPONSE re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-2934NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. Attorney Phillip Lee terminated. (Lee, Phillip) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-08-0635NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. Attorney Thomas B. Watson terminated. (Watson, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-1236MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dwayne D. Sam, :Firm- Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP, :Address- 601 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, South Tower, Suite 600, Washington, DC 20004. Phone No. - 202-843-8342. Fax No. - 202-899-5666 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6317341. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-1237REPLY to opposition re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. (Folkman, Theodore) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jf). (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-13MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Dwayne D. Sam is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/13/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-14NOTICE OF ERROR re 37 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to tfolkman@piercebainbrige.com, cc'd 23 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Same Document using the opposition event (zjf, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1538NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. Attorney Elizabeth V. Curran terminated. (Curran, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-09-0639NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Melanie Hendry (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-1340SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' 29 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/13/2019. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjd) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-1341REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' 29 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/13/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 9/26/2019. Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-10-0742TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on September 26, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-38. Date of Issuance: October 7, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2020.(wz) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-1743Joint STATUS REPORT by JOSEPH JOK, JOHNMARK MAJUC. (Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by November 18, 2019, which updates the court on Defendant's search efforts and, if applicable, proposes a schedule for processing of records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/18/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar