Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLincoln Square Legal Services, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv02217
Date Filed2018-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Analisa Torres
PlaintiffLincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.
Case DescriptionLincoln Square Legal Services submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning 2016 version of the Revenue Procedures. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. More than a year after the request was filed, the IRS located 90 pages. It disclosed 15 pages and withheld 75 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). The agency located an additional 1,325 pages, disclosing 409 pages, but withholding nearly 1,000 pages under Exemption 5. Lincoln Square Legal Services filed an administrative appeal, which was denied by the agency. Lincoln Square Legal Services then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-131COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14803149)Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D, # 5 E, # 6 F, # 7 G, # 8 H, # 9 I, # 10 J)(Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-132CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-133REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Internal Revenue Service, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-134FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron) Modified on 3/14/2018 (pne). (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-135FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron) Modified on 3/14/2018 (pne). (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-136RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc..(Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-14***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ron Lazebnik. The party information for the following party has been modified: Internal Revenue Service. The information for the party has been modified for the following reason: party name was entered in all caps. (pne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-147ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Internal Revenue Service. (pne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ron Lazebnik to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: Summons can only be requested and issued for named defendants. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-148REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Internal Revenue Service c/o United States Attorney, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-149REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Internal Revenue Service c/o Attorney General of the United States, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1510ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Internal Revenue Service. (vf) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1511ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Internal Revenue Service. (vf) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1512INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/4/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/15/2018) (mro) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-1513ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/15/2018) (mro) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-1914AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Internal Revenue Service served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Li, Clerk for the United States Attorney's Office. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-2215LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for April 4, 2018, to April 25, 2018, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ron Lazebnik dated March 22, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint letter to the Court currently scheduled for March 30, 2018, to April 20, 2018, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ron Lazebnik dated March 22, 2018. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc..(Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-2216ORDER granting 15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference (Initial Conference ADJOURNED to 4/25/2018 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres); granting 15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Pretrial Documents. The parties shall submit their initial pretrial documents by 4/18/18. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-0417JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 4/4/18., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 4/4/18. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0418LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Ron Lazebnik dated April 4, 2018 re: Scheduling conflict related to current request by the parties. Document filed by Lincoln Square Legal Services, Inc..(Lazebnik, Ron) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0519ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting in part and denying in part 17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint: GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By May 3, 2018, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. By May 4, 2018, the parties shall submit the joint letter and case management plan. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 25, 2018 is ADJOURNED to May 10, 2018, at 12:40 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 5/10/2018 at 12:40 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/5/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Internal Revenue Service answer due 5/3/2018. (jwh) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff