Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSouthern Environmental Law Center et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictWestern District of Virginia
CityCharlottesville
Case Number3:2018cv00018
Date Filed2018-03-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Glen E. Conrad
PlaintiffSouthern Environmental Law Center
PlaintiffEnvironmental Defense Fund
Case DescriptionThe Southern Environmental Law Center and the Environmental Defense Fund submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning communications between named EPA employees and the Heartland Institute. Both requests asked for a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, granted SELC's fee waiver request, but denied EDF's fee waiver request. The agency indicated that processing the requests could take more than a year. SELC and EDF then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-151COMPLAINT against U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-2856738.), filed by Southern Environmental Law Center, Environmental Defense Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2017-08-01 EDF FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2017-10-19 SELC FOIA Requests, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hnw).
2018-03-152Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (hnw)
2018-03-153Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Environmental Law Center (hnw)
2018-03-154Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Environmental Defense Fund (hnw)
2018-03-155MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice status)(Buppert, Gregory)
2018-03-156MOTION for Benjamin M. Levitan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Environmental Defense Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice status)(Buppert, Gregory)
2018-03-237ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberley Claire Hunter for Southern Environmental Law Center added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/21/18. (hnw)
2018-03-238ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Benjamin Levitan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Levitan for Environmental Defense Fund added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/21/18. (hnw)
2018-04-179Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winn, Sara)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff