Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLYNN v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00587
Date Filed2018-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffKATALIN KADAR LYNN
Case DescriptionKatalin Lynn submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for archived CIA records listed as records about the Grombach Organization. The agency told Lynn that all 733 pages of documents were being withheld under Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 3 (other statutes). Lynn filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lynn filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION
`
Defendant2255
NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION
8601 Adelphia Road
College Park, MD 20740-6001
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-161COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5377118) filed by KATALIN KADAR LYNN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons NARA, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-16Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-203ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/20/2018. (DM) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/28/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-275ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-276ORDER. The parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter by no later than MAY 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/27/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-187PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-218SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/21/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Cross Motion due by 8/16/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/14/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/15/2018. Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 7/16/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/14/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-039Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-09MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 9 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion. Defendant requests a two-week extension of time to file its Summary Judgment Motion because additional time is needed to prepare a declaration from the CIA concerning the classified nature of the records at issue in this case. Plaintiff consents to this request. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than JULY 30, 2018. Plaintiff shall file her opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion, and her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by no later than AUGUST 30, 2018. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, and its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by no later than SEPTEMBER 28, 2018. Plaintiff shall file her reply in support of her Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than OCTOBER 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/9/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 7/30/2018. Plaintiff shall file her opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion, and her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by no later than 8/30/2018. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, and its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by no later than 9/28/2018. Plaintiff shall file her reply in support of her Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 10/29/2018. (kt) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-2410Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 10 Consent Motion for a Brief Further Extension of Time to File Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion. Defendant requests a ten-day extension of time to file its Summary Judgment Motion because additional time is needed for defense counsel to receive declarations from the National Archives and the CIA, and because defense counsel is busy with other matters. This is the second request for an extension of this deadline. Plaintiff consents. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than AUGUST 9, 2018. Plaintiff shall file her opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion, and her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by no later than SEPTEMBER 10, 2018. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, and its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by no later than OCTOBER 9, 2018. Plaintiff shall file her reply in support of her Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than NOVEMBER 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/26/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 8/9/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/10/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/9/2018. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 9/10/2018. Response to Cross Motions due by 10/9/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/8/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-0911MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Mengel Declaration (NARA), # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Mengel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B - Shiner Declaration (CIA))(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar