Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUNDY v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00623
Date Filed2018-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffNATHAN E. GUNDY
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-05Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/5/2018. (jd) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-051COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS filed by NATHAN E. GUNDY. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(jd) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-052MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NATHAN E. GUNDY. (jd) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-053PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by NATHAN E. GUNDY. (jd) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-064ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $10.08 from Prison Account of Nathan Gundy and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Nathan Gundy. See order for full details. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/6/2018. (jd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-06Case Reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-095STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/9/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-136SUMMONS (3) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jd) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff