Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR), et al v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv02008
Date Filed2018-04-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffWill Evans
Case DescriptionCenter for Investigative Reporting Staffwriter Will Evans submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Labor for records concerning EEO-1 reports pertaining to various federal contractors. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. It denied Evans' request under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Evans submitted another FOIA request for correspondence concerning the agency's interaction with the contractors pertaining to the confidentiality of the information. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request and denied it as well under Exemption 4. Evans filed administrative appeals of the denials, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Evans and CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-021COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Labor (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12239866.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR), Will Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/2/2018) Modified on 4/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-022Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-023Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-034Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-035Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Labor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-046CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Will Evans, The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR).. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-057CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Will Evans, The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/5/2018) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-05-078ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Labor. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 5/7/2018) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-079CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-1110CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Labor.. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-06-2011STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines; Proposed Order filed by U.S. Department of Labor. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-2012Order, signed 6/20/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 11 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2018. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-08-1713ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 8/17/2018) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-1714ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 8/17/2018) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-1715NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 8/17/2018) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-2016ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Friday, August 24, 2018 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2117STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines; Proposed Order filed by U.S. Department of Labor. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-2218Order, signed 8/22/18. by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 17 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2018. Case Management Conference re-set for 10/12/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2219ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 8/24/2018 at 10:30 AM Pacific time is reschedule to 10/9/2018 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-10-0520JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Department of Labor. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 10/5/2018) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-1021ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 10/9/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1222Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/12/2018. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Total Time in Court: 3 minutes.)(Not Reported.) Plaintiff Attorney: n/a. Defendant Attorney: Douglas Chang. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1723ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/7/2018 02:00 PM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/17/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar