Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVIZCARRA CALDERON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00764
Date Filed2018-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffYOLANDA VIZCARRA CALDERON
Case DescriptionYolanda Vizcarra Calderon submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning herself. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of her requests. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services told her it was referring three pages to U.S. Immigration and Customs Service. Calderon also submitted a request directly to ICE requesting the records USCIS had referred to ICE. Calderon submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for her records. State told her that it had 68 documents, but disclosed only one document in full and six documents in part. Calderon then resubmitted her request asking for the records the agency had not disclosed. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Calderon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Discovery, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5404671) filed by YOLANDA VIZCARRA CALDERON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DHS, # 5 Summons State)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-042NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by YOLANDA VIZCARRA CALDERON. Case related to Case No. 17-1458. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- W. Asa Hutchison III, :Firm- The Asa Hutchinson Law Group, PLC, :Address- 912 W. Central Avenue. Phone No. - (479) 878-1600. Fax No. - (479) 876-8283 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5404691. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by YOLANDA VIZCARRA CALDERON (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-054SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-09MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/9/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-05-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2018. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-316Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response to the complaint shall now be due by June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/1/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/29/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-297NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-298Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/2/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/27/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-269Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-0110ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/1/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/16/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-1611Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Answer shall be filed on or before September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/20/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-0712Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar