Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00781
Date Filed2018-04-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffNOAH SHACHTMAN
PlaintiffBETSY WOODRUFF
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Daily Beast reporters Noah Shachtman and Betsy Woodruff submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the classification/declassification review of two separate memos written by House Intelligence Committee Chairman Devin Nunes (R-CA) and co-chairman Adam Schiff (D-CA). They also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP, Schactman, and Woodruff filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5407098) filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BETSY WOODRUFF, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) Modified on 4/5/2018 (zsth). (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (zsth) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-184MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN, BETSY WOODRUFF (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DOJ receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-20MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/20/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-208AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BETSY WOODRUFF, NOAH SHACHTMAN.(jf) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-109GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/10/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-2110ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/21/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/05/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-07-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Motgi, Anjali) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 9/4/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/13/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/4/2018 (tj) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar