Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAbbetech Professional Resources, Inc. v. U.S. Department of State The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2018cv00401
Date Filed2018-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge T. S. Ellis, III
PlaintiffAbbetech Professional Resources, Inc.
Case DescriptionAbbtech Professional Resources submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the investigation of an improper sub-source award contract. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Abbtech Professional Resources filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of State The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-091COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6029685.), filed by Abbetech Professional Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-092Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Abbetech Professional Resources, Inc. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-273Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, by Abbetech Professional Resources, Inc.. (Freiberger, Tyler) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-304Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, by Abbetech Professional Resources, Inc.. (Freiberger, Tyler) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-305Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, by Abbetech Professional Resources, Inc.. (Freiberger, Tyler) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-016Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-157SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abbetech Professional Resources, Inc.. U.S. Department of State The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser served on 5/9/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff