Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Steele Law Firm, LLC v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CityKansas City
Case Number4:2018cv00275
Date Filed2018-04-11
Date Closed2018-05-21
JudgeDistrict Judge Gary A. Fenner
PlaintiffThe Steele Law Firm, LLC
Case DescriptionThe Steele Law Firm submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for certified copies of records concerning the staffing data for skilled nursing home facilities for 2014-2016. The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services provided certified records for 2016, but told Steele that the 2014-2015 records were available on its website. Steele filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantCenters for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jonathan Steele on behalf of The Steele Law Firm, LLC. Filing fee waived. Service due by 7/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-112AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jonathan Steele on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA request for 2014 data, # 2 Exhibit FOIA request for 2015 data, # 3 Exhibit FOIA equest for 2016 data, # 4 Exhibit CMS acknowledgement of FOIA request for 2014 data, # 5 Exhibit CMS acknowledgement of FOIA request for 2015 data, # 6 Exhibit CMS production of certified records in response to FOIA request for 2016 data, # 7 Exhibit CMS denial of FOIA request for 2014 data, # 8 Exhibit CMS denial of FOIA request for 2015 data, # 9 Exhibit Pl's appeal regarding CMS denial of FOIA request for 2014 data, # 10 Exhibit Pl's appeal regarding CMS denial of FOIA request for 2015 data, # 11 Exhibit CMS acknowledgement of appeal for 2014 data, # 12 Exhibit CMS acknowledgement of appeal for 2015 data)(Steele, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-12RECEIPT number KCMO069919 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Steele Law Firm LLC. (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-123NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-16SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-104Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Matthew N. Sparks on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Matthew N. Sparks added to party Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew N. Sparks added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft))(Sparks, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-105ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer due 6/15/18. Signed on 5/10/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-216NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Steele, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-217Order of Dismissal. Signed on 5/21/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff