Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePruco Securities LLC v. US Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Alabama
CitySouthern
Case Number2:2018cv00596
Date Filed2018-04-13
Date Closed2018-05-10
JudgeMagistrate Judge John H England, III
PlaintiffPruco Securities LLC
Case DescriptionPruco Securities submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the criminal case, USA v. Anderson, including FBI Form 302 reports. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Pruco Securities that it had no records responsive to its request. Pruco Securities filed an administrative appeal of the decision, which was upheld by the Office of Information Policy. Pruco Securities then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-131COMPLAINT against US Department of Justice, filed by Pruco Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(MRR, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-16Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3068249, NDAL receipt #B4601088286. (Waldrop, E) Modified on 4/16/2018 (JLC). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-162NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-173Summons Issued as to US Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-254Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pruco Securities LLC. filed by Pruco Securities LLC (Waldrop, E) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-255SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pruco Securities LLC. US Department of Justice served on 4/23/2018, answer due 6/22/2018. (Waldrop, E) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-256SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pruco Securities LLC. (Waldrop, E) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-257SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pruco Securities LLC. (Waldrop, E) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-108NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pruco Securities LLC (Waldrop, E) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-109ORDER DISMISSING CASE - A notice of dismissal having been filed in this action, it is hereby ORDERED , ADJUDGED , and DECREED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice , costs taxed as paid.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/10/18. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff