Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRANCIS et al v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00823
Date Filed2018-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffBrad S. Francis
PlaintiffCHRISTINE C. FRANCIS
Case DescriptionBrad and Christine Francis requested records from the IRS concerning transcripts pertaining to their taxes for specific tax periods. Although they did not make a FOIA request, they brought suit under the Administrative Procedure Act and FOIA.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-061COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090443) filed by BRAD S. FRANCIS, CHRISTINE C. FRANCIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-10SUMMONS (4) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-05-092MOTION for CM/ECF Password by BRAD S. FRANCIS, CHRISTINE C. FRANCIS (ztd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/30/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 5/1/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Sessions, # 2 IRS, # 3 Zuckerman)(ztd) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' 2 Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith ISSUE a CM/ECF User Name and Password to the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 14, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-153NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Bryce Miller on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-154GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 15, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-296Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 6 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiffs' complaint on or before June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 29, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the complaint due by 6/29/2018, (hs) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-287Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 7 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiffs' complaint on or before July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 28, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/13/2018, (hs) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-138MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Miller, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-239Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CHRISTINE C. FRANCIS, Brad S. Francis. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A, # 2 Affidavit B, # 3 Affidavit C, # 4 Affidavit D, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 13 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Francis, Brad) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2610REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar