Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarroll v. U.S. Department of Interior
DistrictEastern District of Louisiana
CityNew Orleans
Case Number2:2018cv03881
Date Filed2018-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Barry W Ashe
PlaintiffRobert H Carroll
Case DescriptionRobert Carroll, a Department of the Interior employee at the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement in New Orleans, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the report of the investigation conducted by BSEE employee Linda Schubert into the hiring practices of BSEE. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records based on Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Carroll filed an administrative appeal of the Glomar response. His appeal was denied. Carroll then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of Interior
DefendantU.S. Department of Interior Through Ryan Zinke, Secretary
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-111COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Interior (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Robert H Carroll. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibits 1-4)(sa) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-182Request of Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Interior filed by Robert H Carroll re 1 Complaint. (sa) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-193Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(sa) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-024SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Department of Interior served on 4/30/2018, answer due 6/29/2018. (sa) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-025SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Department of Interior served through U.S. Attorney General Department of Justice on 4/30/2018. (sa) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-026SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Department of Interior served through U.S. Attorney's Office on 4/24/2018. (sa) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-247EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by U.S. Department of Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney K. Paige O'Hale added to party U.S. Department of Interior(pty:dft).(O'Hale, K.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-258TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint as to U.S. Department of Interior answer due 6/14/2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/25/18. (ecm) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-149ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Interior.(O'Hale, K.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-2110RESPONSE to Defendant's Answer and Defenses (Rec. Doc. 9 ), and MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index by Robert H Carroll. (sa) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-0311ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 10 MOTION to Compel Vaughn Index filed by Robert H Carroll. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (NEF: JVM)(ecm) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-0512ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that 10 MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index is set for submission on 7/25/2018. Defendant's memorandum in opposition shall be filed on or before 7/17/2018. Plaintiff's memorandum in reply, if any, shall be filed by 7/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 7/5/2018.(ajn) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-1713RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Department of Interior re 10 MOTION to Compel Vaughn Index . (O'Hale, K.) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-2514REPLY Memorandum filed by Robert H Carroll in Support of 10 MOTION to Compel a Vaughn Index. (sa) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-0915ORDER AND REASONS denying 10 Motion to Compel, as premature for reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 8/9/2018. (caa) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-2116SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2018 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. The Court will initiate the telephone conference call. Issued by case manager.(ecm) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-0417SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 02:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. All discovery must be completed by 2/4/2019. Counsel for the Government shall initiate the call and contact the undersigned's chambers at (504) 589-7585 once all parties are on the line. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. 1 day Bench Trial set for 4/24/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Issued by case manager. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ecm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1118ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/10/2018.(clc) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1719**DEFICIENT** MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert H Carroll. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(clc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1720NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 10/9/2018. (clc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-2521MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert H Carroll. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Submission)(clc) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-0122ORDER : ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for Thursday, October 11, 2018, at 2:30 p.m., is cancelled. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/1/18.(clc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0223RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Department of Interior re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (O'Hale, K.) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar