Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLIS v. DOJ
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00869
Date Filed2018-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCALLEN WILLIS
Case DescriptionCallen Willis submitted FOIA requests to the Civil Rights Division at the Department of Justice for records about himself. The agency failed to respond and Willis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDOJ Civil Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-13Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/13/2018. (zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-131COMPLAINT against DOJ filed by CALLEN WILLIS.(zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CALLEN WILLIS (Attachment: # 1 Supplement)(zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-133NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CALLEN WILLIS. Case related to Case No. 16-1092, 17-1742, 17-2038, 17-1959. (zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-134MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index by CALLEN WILLIS (zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-135LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by CALLEN WILLIS 1 Complaint filed by CALLEN WILLIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement 2, # 2 Supplement 3, # 3 Supplement 4, # 4 Supplement 5, # 5 Supplement 6, # 6 Supplement 7, # 7 Supplement 8, # 8 Supplement 9, # 9 Supplement 10)(zsb) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-106FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/10/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-17Case Reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-06-047SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DOJ, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2018. (jf) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/06/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2018.) (jf) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1610NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of DOJ (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1611ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DOJ.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-20MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/20/18. (ms) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2012ORDER directing Defendant to file a status report by August 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/20/18. (ms) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/24/2018 (gdf) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-1313MOTION to Redact by CALLEN WILLIS (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-28MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff asks that this Court "redact personal identifiers found in any and all documents associated with this case." Mot. to Redact at 1. Specifically, she asks that her address, phone number, social security number, and email address be redacted. Id. The parties are responsible for redacting personal identifiers from their court filings, see Local Civil Rule 5.4(f), and Plaintiff cites no authority for the proposition that the Court now is obligated to redact information appearing on documents Plaintiff already has filed. Furthermore, the parties' names, addresses, and the telephone numbers of parties proceeding pro se are required by Local Civil Rule 5.1(c)(1). It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Redact 13 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/28/18. (ms) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-2814MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Status Report by DOJ (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-2815STATUS REPORT by DOJ. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-29MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Deadline to File Its Status Report 14 is GRANTED. On consideration of Defendant's Status Report 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/29/18. (ms) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar