Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOsen LLC v. Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv03511
Date Filed2018-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Paul Oetken
PlaintiffOsen LLC
Case DescriptionOsen LLC, a law firm representing U.S. service members and their families who had been killed or injured in Afghanistan, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Foreign Assets Control at the Department of the Treasury for unclassified records concerning OFAC's designation of James Alexander McLintock and Al-Rahmah Welfare Organization as subject to sanction. OFAC acknowledged receipt of the request. OFAC told Osen that there were some unclassified materials but most of the records were classified and the agency would need to review them for segregability. After OFAC told Osen there were still 69 cases ahead of theirs, Osen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of Foreign Assets Control of the Department of the Treasury
DefendantOffice of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-201COMPLAINT against Office of Foreign Assets Control of the Department of the Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14968697)Document filed by Osen LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jan. 3, 2017 FOIA Request to Treasury, # 2 Exhibit B - April 4, 2017 Amendment to FOIA Request to Treasury, # 3 Exhibit C - February 3, 2017 Treasury Acknowledgement of Receipt of FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit D - February 8, 2017 Treasury Request for 10-Day Extension, # 5 Exhibit E - Sept. 18, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit F - Sept. 20, 2017 Treasury Response to FOIA Status Request, # 7 Exhibit G - Sept. 25, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 8 Exhibit H - Oct. 10, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 9 Exhibit I - Oct. 17, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 10 Exhibit J - Oct. 17, 2018 OFAC Response to FOIA Status Request, # 11 Exhibit K - Oct. 17, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 12 Exhibit L - OFAC Response to FOIA Status Request, # 13 Exhibit M - Oct. 18, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 14 Exhibit N - Nov. 21, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 15 Exhibit O - Nov. 21, 2017 OFAC Response to FOIA Status Request, # 16 Exhibit P - Nov. 29, 2017 OFAC Response to FOIA Status Request, # 17 Exhibit Q - Dec. 19, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 18 Exhibit R - Dec. 21, 2017 OFAC Response to FOIA Status Request, # 19 Exhibit S - Jan. 8, 2017 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 20 Exhibit T - Jan. 19, 2018 Follow-Up to FOIA Request, # 21 Exhibit U - Jan. 29, 2018 OFAC Response to FOIA Status Request, # 22 Exhibit V - Jan. 29, 2018 Follow-Up to FOIA Request)(Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-202REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Foreign Assets Control U.S. Department of the Treasury, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-203CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-204RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Osen LLC.(Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-205NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dina Zahavah Gielchinsky on behalf of Osen LLC. New Address: Osen LLC, 1441 Broadway, Suite 6022, New York, New York, USA 10018, (212) 354-0111. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-206NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Adam Friedman on behalf of Osen LLC. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dina Gielchinsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Office of Foreign Assets Control of the Department of the Treasury. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-237ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury. (pc) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-148AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff