Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKlamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center v. United States Department of Interior
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityMedford
Case Number1:2018cv00683
Date Filed2018-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke
PlaintiffKlamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center an Oregon non-profit corporation, P.O. Box 102 Ashland, OR 97502
DefendantDepartment of the Interior
DefendantUnited States Department of Interior an agency of the United States of America, 1849 C Street, N.W. Washington DC 20240
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-201Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5386226 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Klamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center against Department of the Interior (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BLM's initial response, # 2 Exhibit BLM response KS Wild protest with redactions, # 3 Exhibit BLM response Attachment 1-4 with highlighting and comments). (Minter, Brodia) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-202Proposed Summons Filed by Klamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center. (Minter, Brodia) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-203Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, 1 . Filed by Klamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center. (Minter, Brodia) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-204Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Klamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center. (Minter, Brodia) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-235Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/21/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/20/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 9/20/2018. Dispositive motions are due 9/20/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-236Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order,, 5 . Dispositive Motions are due by 9/20/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-237Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Klamath Siskiyou Wildlands Center. (Minter, Brodia) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-238Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Interior. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff